EP0050600 - Apparatus for lubrication of rails [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1986 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AB ERIK BOHLIN Gardsvägen 2 S-171 52 Solna / SE | [1982/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wedlin, Per Helsingörsgatan 22 S-163 42 Solna / SE | [1982/17] | Representative(s) | Nordén, J. Ake Stockholms Patentbyra Zacco AB Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/17] | Nordén, Ake Oscar Grahn Patentbyra AB Box 19540 S-104 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 81850173.6 | 30.09.1981 | [1982/17] | Priority number, date | SE19800007317 | 17.10.1980 Original published format: SE 8007317 | [1982/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0050600 | Date: | 28.04.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0050600 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B61K3/02 | [1982/17] | CPC: |
B61K3/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1982/17] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Schmieren von Schienen | [1982/17] | English: | Apparatus for lubrication of rails | [1982/17] | French: | Dispositif pour lubrifier des rails | [1982/17] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 25.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/01] | 09.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1983 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.1983 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.05.1985 | CH | 22.05.1985 | IT | 22.05.1985 | LI | 22.05.1985 | [1999/42] |
Former [1989/18] | AT | 22.05.1985 | |
CH | 22.05.1985 | ||
LI | 22.05.1985 | ||
Former [1986/45] | AT | 22.05.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | CH101537 [ ] (STAEDTISCHE STRASSENBAHNEN BER [CH]); | AU447787B [ ]; | DE2353912 [ ] (LIMON FLUHME & CO DE) |