Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
18.04.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 07.06.1989 [1989/23] |
22.09.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.11.1987 [1987/46] |
11.10.1986 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.11.1986 [1986/48] |
10.09.1982 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.11.1982 [1982/45] |
10.09.1982 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.11.1982 [1982/45] |