Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7588181 | Global Dossier | 07.06.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | US8101195 | 08.09.1981 | US20578980 | 10.11.1980 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR8108831 | 24.08.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | US8101195 | 08.09.1981 | US20578980 | 10.11.1980 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3175651D1 | 15.01.1987 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US8101195 | 08.09.1981 | US20578980 | 10.11.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8201682 | Global Dossier | 27.05.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20578980 | 10.11.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0064057 | Global Dossier | 26.11.1986 | B1 | EP0064057 | 07.11.1984 | A4 | EP0064057 | 10.11.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20578980 | 10.11.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BE891035 | 01.03.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | US20578980 | 10.11.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1159296 | 27.12.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US20578980 | 10.11.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8302586 | 01.02.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20578980 | 10.11.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0159102B | 14.12.1989 | B2 | JPS57501719 | 24.09.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | US20578980 | 10.11.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4352669 | 05.10.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | US20578980 | 10.11.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA816422 | 29.09.1982 | B | Priority number | Date | US20578980 | 10.11.1980 |