EP0073034 - A process for making a urethane elastomer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DATAPRODUCTS CORPORATION 6200 Canoga Avenue Woodland Hills California 91365 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/09] | For all designated states DATAPRODUCTS CORPORATION 6200 Canoga Avenue Woodland Hills California 91365 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Slagel, Edwin Charles 2475, North Medina Avenue Simi Valley California 93063 / US | [1983/09] | Representative(s) | Zenz, Joachim Klaus, et al ZENZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rüttenscheider Strasse 2 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Zenz, Joachim Klaus, et al ZENZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Huyssenallee 58-64 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1983/09] | Zenz, Joachim Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Am Ruhrstein 1 D-45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 82107638.7 | 20.08.1982 | [1983/09] | Priority number, date | US19810294716 | 20.08.1981 Original published format: US 294716 | [1983/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0073034 | Date: | 02.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0073034 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/76, C08G18/10, C08G18/32 | [1986/52] | CPC: |
C08G18/7621 (EP,US);
B41N1/22 (EP,US);
C08G18/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/3243 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/09] | C08G18/76, C08G18/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Urethan Elastomers | [1983/09] | English: | A process for making a urethane elastomer | [1983/09] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un élastomère d'uréthane | [1983/09] | Examination procedure | 03.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/41] | 02.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP7938399 ; | [X]US3316285 (CLEVELAND THOMAS H); | [Y]US3034791 (GALLAGHER RICHARD J); | [Y]US3142652 (PACE HENRY A); | [A]FR2264005 (POLAROID CORP [US]) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 91, no. 10, September 1979, page 47, no. 75527q, Columbus Ohio (USA); & JP - A - 79 38 399 (IHARA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD.) (22-03-1979), & JP7938399 A 00000000 |