Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0083092
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
19.06.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |
12.03.1990 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.05.1990 [1990/18] |
18.03.1989 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.05.1989 [1989/18] |
14.02.1989 |
Change - representative |
published on 05.04.1989 [1989/14] |
14.12.1988 |
Change - representative |
published on 01.02.1989 [1989/05] |
19.08.1988 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.10.1988 [1988/40] |
27.04.1987 |
First examination report |
|
05.03.1986 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.04.1986 [1986/17] |
30.10.1985 |
Publication of search report |
published on 02.01.1986 [1986/01] |
05.05.1983 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.07.1983 [1983/27] |