Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE42873T | 15.05.1989 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP82111982 | 23.12.1982 | DE3151406 | 24.12.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3279674D1 | 08.06.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3279674 | 23.12.1982 | DE3151406 | 24.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0083092 | Global Dossier | 03.05.1989 | B1 | EP0083092 | 02.01.1986 | A3 | EP0083092 | 06.07.1983 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3151406 | 24.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3151406 | 07.07.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3151406 | 24.12.1981 |