EP0083092 - Shield for medium voltage switchgear and distribution plant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/27] | Isolating shield for medium voltage switchgear and distribution plant parts | ||
[1989/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.1990 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asea Brown Boveri Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/40] | For all designated states Asea Brown Boveri Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1983/27] | For all designated states BROWN, BOVERI & CIE Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krämer, Wilhelm Hegelstrasse 2 D-6902 Sandhausen / DE | [1983/27] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1989/14] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1989/05] | Kempe, Wolfgang, Dr. c/o BROWN, BOVERI & CIE AG ZPT Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 31 / DE | ||
Former [1983/27] | Kempe, Wolfgang, Dr. c/o BROWN, BOVERI & CIE AG ZPT Postfach 351 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 82111982.3 | 23.12.1982 | [1983/27] | Priority number, date | DE19813151406 | 24.12.1981 Original published format: DE 3151406 | [1983/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0083092 | Date: | 06.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0083092 | Date: | 02.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0083092 | Date: | 03.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H02B13/00, H02B13/02 | [1983/27] | CPC: |
H02B13/045 (EP);
H02B13/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, LI, NL, SE [1983/27] | Title | German: | Kapselung einer elektrischen Mittelspannungsschalt- und -verteileranlage | [1989/18] | English: | Shield for medium voltage switchgear and distribution plant | [1989/18] | French: | Blindage isolant pour une installation de commutation et de répartition moyenne tension | [1989/18] |
Former [1983/27] | Isolierstoffkapselung für Anlagenteile einer elektrischen Mittelspannungsschalt- und -verteileranlage | ||
Former [1983/27] | Isolating shield for medium voltage switchgear and distribution plant parts | ||
Former [1983/27] | Blindage isolant pour élément d'installation d'une installation de commutation et de répartition moyenne tension | Examination procedure | 19.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/17] | 28.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 08.07.1988 | Appeal received | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/18] | Request for further processing for: | 05.07.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 15.07.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.09.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1261840 (COQ NV); | [A]DE2804607 (DRIESCHER SPEZIALFAB FRITZ) |