Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.1988 [1988/02] |
13.12.1986 | (Expected) grant | published on 28.01.1987 [1987/05] |
10.05.1985 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 10.07.1985 [1985/28] |
28.02.1984 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.05.1984 [1984/18] |
08.08.1983 | Publication of search report | published on 12.10.1983 [1983/41] |
28.05.1983 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.07.1983 [1983/30] |