Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0170775 | Global Dossier | 12.10.1994 | B2 | EP0170775 | 08.11.1989 | B1 | EP0170775 | 12.02.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | EP82112007 | 24.12.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE25244T | 15.02.1987 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | EP82112007 | 24.12.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE47838T | 15.11.1989 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | EP85103730 | 24.12.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1206478 | 24.06.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | CA418453 | 23.12.1982 | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | CA461836 | 24.08.1984 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3151690 | 07.07.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3210701 | 06.10.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3275293D1 | 05.03.1987 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3275293 | 24.12.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3280014D1 | 14.12.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | EP82112007 | 24.12.1982 | DE3280014 | 24.12.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI80675C | 10.07.1990 | C | FI80675B | 30.03.1990 | B | FI883456 | 21.07.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | FI824474 | 27.12.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU194278 | 28.01.1988 | B | Priority number | Date | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IE56170 | 08.05.1991 | B1 | IE881904L | 22.06.1983 | L | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | IE306582 | 23.12.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9203413 | 01.08.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO158799C | 02.11.1988 | C | NO158799B | 25.07.1988 | B | NO832741L | 30.06.1983 | L | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | NO832741 | 27.07.1983 | NO824394 | 28.12.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ214877 | 08.01.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | NZ20290382 | 23.12.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA829523 | 26.10.1983 | B | Priority number | Date | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU559140B | Global Dossier | 26.02.1987 | B2 | AU9193182 | 07.07.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0084164 | Global Dossier | 28.01.1987 | B1 | EP0084164 | 12.10.1983 | A3 | EP0084164 | 27.07.1983 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR247571 | 31.01.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BG60936B | 28.06.1996 | B2 | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1341296 | 25.09.2001 | C | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CS409591 | 15.04.1992 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK171232B | 05.08.1996 | B1 | DK119992D0 | 28.09.1992 | D0 | DK119992 | 28.09.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK170444B | 04.09.1995 | B1 | DK576782 | 30.06.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DZ490 | 13.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8308850 | 01.10.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8402271 | 16.01.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI80017C | 10.04.1990 | C | FI80017B | 29.12.1989 | B | FI824474L | 30.06.1983 | L | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR78413 | 27.09.1984 | B | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK74989 | 22.09.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU194167 | 28.01.1988 | B | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IE55867 | 14.02.1991 | B1 | IE823065L | 29.06.1983 | L | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL67572 | 18.08.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH064586B | 19.01.1994 | B2 | JPH01301659 | 05.12.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH01301695 | 05.12.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0587504B | 16.12.1993 | B2 | JPS58118569 | 14.07.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR890003424B | 20.09.1989 | B1 | KR840002810 | 21.07.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | LU88263I | 03.02.1994 | I2 | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA19672 | 01.07.1983 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL930048I2 | 03.01.1994 | I2 | NL930048I | 01.09.1993 | I1 | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO156786C | 25.11.1987 | C | NO156786B | 17.08.1987 | B | NO824394L | 30.06.1983 | L | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ202903 | 08.01.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH18918 | 06.11.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH19771 | 27.06.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT76052 | 28.11.1985 | B | PT76052 | 01.01.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG1389G | 02.06.1989 | G | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4933361 | 12.06.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5008400 | 16.04.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5101039 | 31.03.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3210701 | 24.03.1982 | DE3151690 | 29.12.1981 | Type | Divisional application | EP0170775 |