Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | | CH | | DE | | FR | | GB | | IT | | LI | | LU | | NL | | SE | | Examination procedure | 20.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | European patent granted | 28.01.1987 | Opposition procedure | 29.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.01.1988 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 24.04.1987 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Event date: | 13.01.1988 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | | Event date: | 31.12.1991 | | Event description: | IT: LAST PAID ANNUAL FEE | | Event date: | 21.01.1994 | | Event description: | LU: LAST PAID ANNUAL FEE | | Event date: | 27.07.1983 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL SE | | Event date: | 12.10.1983 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL SE | | Event date: | 28.01.1987 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL SE | | Event date: | 02.05.1984 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19840223 | | Event date: | 28.01.1987 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 25244 | Country of Ref Document: | AT | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19870215 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | T | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 03.03.1987 | | Event description: | IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED | | Event date: | 05.03.1987 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 3275293 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19870305 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 23.04.1993 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CL | Code Expl.: | CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES | | Event date: | 29.06.2001 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PUE | Code Expl.: | ASSIGNMENT | OWNER: | HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT TRANSFER- AVENTIS PHARM | | Event date: | 01.01.2002 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB IF02 | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01 | | Event date: | 31.01.1995 | | Event description: | SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN | Ref Document Number: | 82112007.8 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | F | | Event date: | 02.01.2002 | | Event description: | NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS | OWNER: | AVENTIS PHARMA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH | | Event date: | 31.01.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 04.02.2003 | | Event description: | SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED | | Event date: | 20.12.2002 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR TP | Code Expl.: | TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY | | Event date: | 03.03.2003 | | Event description: | NL: CEASED DUE TO REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20021224 | | Event date: | 15.01.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB PE20 | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS | Effective DATE: | 20021223 | | Event date: | 15.01.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB CTFE | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE ENTERED INTO FORCE | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SPC/GB93/146 | Filing DATE: | 20021224 | Expiry DATE: | 20070218 | | Event date: | 11.09.1992 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CC | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) LAID OPEN TO THE PUBLIC (LAW OF 25 JUNE 1990) | Free Format Text: | FRCC 92C0308, 920526 | | Event date: | 31.12.1992 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CB | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) GRANTED (LAW OF 25 JUNE 1990) | Free Format Text: | FRCB 92C0308, 821224 | | Event date: | 01.09.1993 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL AC1 | Code Expl.: | APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | NLAC1 930048, 930603 | | Event date: | 08.09.1993 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB CTFF | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | GBCTFFSPC/GB93/146, 930701 | | Event date: | 03.01.1994 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL KC1 | Code Expl.: | GRANT OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | NLKC1 930048, 20021224, EXPIRES:20070218 | | Event date: | 06.04.1994 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB CTFG | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | Free Format Text: | GBCTFGSPC/GB93/146 940311, EXPIRES:20070218 | | Event date: | 10.05.1995 | | Event description: | IT: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FOR PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS: GRANTED | Free Format Text: | CCP 490, 19950307; HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT | | Event date: | 14.06.1996 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH SPCF | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | CHSPCFIKS 52771/940826, 960223 | | Event date: | 30.04.1997 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH SPCG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | Free Format Text: | IKS 52771/19940826, 19960223, EXPIRES:20071223 | | Event date: | 04.05.1998 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE SPCF | Code Expl.: | APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | 9890012, 970411 | | Event date: | 13.07.2001 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH SPCM | Code Expl.: | CERTIFICATES - MODIFICATION OF ASSIGNMENT | Free Format Text: | HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 FRANKFURT AM MAIN (DE)TRANSFER-AVENTIS PHARMA DEUTSCHLAND GMBH 65926 FRANKFURT AM MAIN(DE) | | Event date: | 31.12.2002 | | Event description: | BE: PATENT EXPIRED | OWNER: | *AVENTIS PHARMA DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H. | Effective DATE: | 20021224 | | Event date: | 14.03.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB SPCE | Code Expl.: | -SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE EXPIRED | Free Format Text: | SPC/GB93/146:, EXPIRES: 20070218 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SPC/GB93/146 | Expiry DATE: | 20070218 | | Event date: | 24.12.2002 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20021224 | | Event date: | 23.12.2002 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20021223 | | Event date: | 23.12.2002 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20021223 | | Event date: | 23.12.2002 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20021223 | | Event date: | 24.12.2002 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20021224 | | Event date: | 24.12.2002 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20021224 | | Event date: | 24.10.2001 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20011024 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 20.12.2001 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20011220 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 15.10.2001 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20011015 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 05.10.2001 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20011005 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 11.10.2001 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20011011 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 12.10.2001 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20011012 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 23.10.2001 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20011023 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 11.10.2001 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20011011 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 12.10.2001 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20011012 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Event date: | 06.03.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR RN | Code Expl.: | APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 92C0308 | | Event date: | 15.05.2009 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR FC | Code Expl.: | DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL TO APPROVE REQUEST FOR RESTORATION | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 92C0308 | | Event date: | 31.01.2008 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH SPCL | Code Expl.: | -SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE DELETION | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C00084164/01 | | Event date: | 13.12.1986 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 08.08.1983 | | Event description: | SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013 | | Event date: | 28.05.1983 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 24.11.1987 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 24.11.1987 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |