EP0084164 - Derivatives of bicyclic amino acids, process for their preparation, agents containing them and their use, as well as bicyclic amino acids as intermediates, and process for preparing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.1988 [1988/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/30] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Urbach, Hansjörg, Dr. Le Lavandoustrasse 41 D-6242 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | 02 /
Henning, Rainer, Dr. Völklinger Weg 56 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 71 / DE | 03 /
Teetz, Volker, Dr. An der Tann 20 D-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | 04 /
Geiger, Rolf, Prof. Dr. Heinrich-Bleicher-Strasse 33 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 50 / DE | 05 /
Becker, Reinhard, Dr. Adelheidstrasse 101 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | 06 /
Gaul, Holger Albert-Schweitzer-Strasse 2 D-6251 Niederneisen / DE | [1983/30] | Application number, filing date | 82112007.8 | 24.12.1982 | [1983/30] | Priority number, date | DE19813151690 | 29.12.1981 Original published format: DE 3151690 | DE19823210701 | 24.03.1982 Original published format: DE 3210701 | [1983/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0084164 | Date: | 27.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0084164 | Date: | 12.10.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0084164 | Date: | 28.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/42, C07D209/52, A61K31/40 | [1983/30] | CPC: |
C07D215/227 (EP,US);
C07D209/32 (KR);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D209/08 (EP,US);
C07D209/34 (EP,US);
C07D209/42 (EP,US);
C07D209/52 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/30] | Title | German: | Neue Derivate bicyclischer Aminosäuren, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, diese enthaltende Mittel und deren Verwendung sowie neue bicyclische Aminosäuren als Zwischenstufen und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1983/30] | English: | Derivatives of bicyclic amino acids, process for their preparation, agents containing them and their use, as well as bicyclic amino acids as intermediates, and process for preparing them | [1983/30] | French: | Dérivés d'amino-acides bicycliques, procédé pour leur préparation, agents les contenant et leur utilisation ainsi que des amino-acides bicycliques comme intermédiaires et procédé pour leur préparation | [1983/30] | Examination procedure | 23.02.1984 | Examination requested [1984/18] | 08.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP85103730.9 / EP0170775 | Opposition(s) | 29.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0031741 (SCIENCE UNION & CIE [FR]); | [X]EP0037231 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]); | [AP]EP0051301 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) |