EP0074701 - Fuel cell system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.1985 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/12] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kothmann, Richard Edward 866 Stevendale Drive Pittsburgh Pennsylvania / US | [1983/12] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/12] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 82302131.6 | 26.04.1982 | [1983/12] | Priority number, date | US19810295976 | 25.08.1981 Original published format: US 295976 | [1983/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0074701 | Date: | 23.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04 | [1983/12] | CPC: |
F28F13/06 (EP,US);
H01M8/04029 (US);
H01M8/0258 (EP);
H01M8/0267 (EP);
H01M8/04014 (EP,US);
H01M8/04097 (US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1983/12] | Title | German: | Brennstoffzellensystem | [1983/12] | English: | Fuel cell system | [1983/12] | French: | Système de piles à combustible | [1983/12] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 20.09.1983 | Examination requested [1983/48] | 27.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/31] | 28.01.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1558081 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP); | [A]US3709736 (ADLHART O, et al) |