Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU551583B | Global Dossier | 08.05.1986 | B2 | AU8815882 | 23.06.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US33028081 | 14.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0081898 | Global Dossier | 17.10.1984 | A3 | EP0081898 | 22.06.1983 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US33028081 | 14.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1180655 | 08.01.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US33028081 | 14.12.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4451084 | 29.05.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US33028081 | 14.12.1981 |