EP0081898 - An adjustment means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.05.1987 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIMMONS UNIVERSAL CORPORATION 640 Fifth Avenue New York / US | [1983/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seeley, Wayne C. 2300 Derry Road York Pennsylvania / US | [1983/25] | Representative(s) | Sommerville, John Henry, et al Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/25] | Sommerville, John Henry, et al SOMMERVILLE & RUSHTON 11 Holywell Hill St. Albans Hertfordshire, AL1 1EZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 82304871.5 | 16.09.1982 | [1983/25] | Priority number, date | US19810330280 | 14.12.1981 Original published format: US 330280 | [1983/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0081898 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0081898 | Date: | 17.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A47C7/40 | [1983/25] | CPC: |
A47C7/402 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32434 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/25] | Title | German: | Regelvorrichtung | [1983/25] | English: | An adjustment means | [1983/25] | French: | Dispositif de réglage | [1983/25] | File destroyed: | 26.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/12] | 04.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1987/27] | 16.02.1987 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1987/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1986 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2809991 (BAUMEISTER FA WILHELM) |