Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | |
10.04.1990 | Refusal of application | published on 30.05.1990 [1990/22] |
01.08.1986 | Change - first examination report | published on 17.09.1986 [1986/38] |
24.02.1986 | First examination report | |
29.08.1984 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.10.1984 [1984/44] |
29.05.1984 | Publication of search report | published on 01.08.1984 [1984/31] |
27.06.1983 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.08.1983 [1983/34] |
25.06.1983 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.08.1983 [1983/34] |