Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0087788 | Global Dossier | 08.10.1986 | B1 | EP0087788 | 11.01.1984 | A3 | EP0087788 | 07.09.1983 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2691082 | 26.02.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3366810D1 | 13.11.1986 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2691082 | 26.02.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK158486C | 22.10.1990 | C | DK158486B | 21.05.1990 | B | DK86383 | 27.08.1983 | A | DK86383D0 | 24.02.1983 | D0 | Priority number | Date | JP2691082 | 26.02.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI78214C | 12.06.1989 | C | FI78214B | 28.02.1989 | B | FI830632L | 27.08.1983 | L | Priority number | Date | JP2691082 | 26.02.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS623904Y | 28.01.1987 | Y2 | JPS58130379U | 03.09.1983 | U | Priority number | Date | JP2691082 | 26.02.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO159830C | 08.02.1989 | C | NO159830B | 31.10.1988 | B | NO830625L | 29.08.1983 | L | Priority number | Date | JP2691082 | 26.02.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4710136 | 01.12.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2691082 | 26.02.1982 |