EP0087788 - Mounting structure for electronic apparatus or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1987 [1987/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Tokkesi c/o NEC CORPORATION, 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP | [1986/52] |
Former [1986/48] | 01 /
Suzuki, Takeshi c/o NIPPON ELECTRIC COMPANY, LTD. c/o NEC CORPORATION, 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Tokyo 108 / JP | ||
Former [1983/36] | 01 /
Suzuki, Takeshi c/o NIPPON ELECTRIC COMPANY, LTD. 33-1, Shiba Gochome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/36] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83101886.6 | 25.02.1983 | [1983/36] | Priority number, date | JP19820026910 | 26.02.1982 Original published format: JP 2691082 | [1983/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0087788 | Date: | 07.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0087788 | Date: | 11.01.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0087788 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14 | [1983/36] | CPC: |
H05K5/0204 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1983/36] | Title | German: | Einbaustruktur für elektrisches Gerät oder dergleichen | [1983/36] | English: | Mounting structure for electronic apparatus or the like | [1983/36] | French: | Structure de montage pour appareillage électronique ou similaire | [1983/36] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.12.1983 | Examination requested [1984/07] | 29.03.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2871457 (JENCKS HAROLD S, et al); | [Y]FR2109686 (VOXSON SPA); | [A]BE693609 |