EP0104531 - Cycloaliphatic diisocyanates, possibly in the form of a mixture of isomers, method for their preparation and their use as starting products in the preparation of synthetic products of the polyurethane type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1986 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.11.1986 [1986/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/14] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knöfel, Hartmut, Dr. Dülmener Weg 21 D-5068 Odenthal-Erberich / DE | 02 /
Brockelt, Michael Neuenhauser Weg 1 D-5060 Bergisch-Gladbach 2 / DE | 03 /
Penninger, Stefan, Dr. Pommernallee 5 D-4047 Dormagen 1 / DE | 04 /
Stutz, Herbert, Dr. Schulstrasse 81 D-4047 Dormagen 5 / DE | [1984/14] | Application number, filing date | 83108982.6 | 12.09.1983 | [1984/14] | Priority number, date | DE19823234996 | 22.09.1982 Original published format: DE 3234996 | [1984/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0104531 | Date: | 04.04.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0104531 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07C119/045, C08G18/75 | [1984/14] | CPC: |
C07C265/10 (EP,US);
C08G18/758 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/14] | Title | German: | Gegebenenfalls Isomerengemische darstellende cycloaliphatische Diisocyanate, ein Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung, sowie ihre Verwendung als Ausgangsmaterialien bei der Herstellung von Polyurethankunststoffen | [1984/14] | English: | Cycloaliphatic diisocyanates, possibly in the form of a mixture of isomers, method for their preparation and their use as starting products in the preparation of synthetic products of the polyurethane type | [1984/14] | French: | Diisocyanates cycloaliphatiques, éventuellement sous forme de mélanges d'isomères, leur méthode de préparation et leur utilisation comme produits de départ dans la préparation de produits synthétiques du type polyuréthanes | [1984/14] | Examination procedure | 12.09.1983 | Examination requested [1984/14] | 23.08.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.03.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2361986 (POLYCHROME CORP); | [Y]EP0024665 ; | [Y]EP0046917 (BAYER AG [DE]) | Examination | DE1768832 | - Houben-Weyl, Methoden der organischen Chemie, Bd. 111(1950), S. 356-357 | - Bayer-Kunststoffe, 3e Ausgabe (1963) 543 | - Beilsteins Handbuch der organischen Chemie, 4e Aufl, (1930), Bd 13, S. 238, 254 |