Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0108635
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
05.10.2005 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
24.11.1995 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 10.01.1996 [1996/02] |
30.03.1989 |
Opposition filed |
published on 17.05.1989 [1989/20] |
16.01.1989 |
Opposition filed |
published on 08.03.1989 [1989/10] |
23.04.1988 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.06.1988 [1988/23] |
25.05.1987 |
Change - first examination report |
published on 15.07.1987 [1987/29] |
04.11.1986 |
First examination report |
|
15.11.1985 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.01.1986 [1986/03] |
26.03.1985 |
Publication of search report |
published on 29.05.1985 [1985/22] |
17.03.1984 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.05.1984 [1984/20] |