Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4550449 | 05.11.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US43996282 | 08.11.1982 | US66804284 | 05.11.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2786997B | Global Dossier | 13.08.1998 | B2 | JPH0889567 | 09.04.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US43996282 | 08.11.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU561150B | Global Dossier | 30.04.1987 | B2 | AU2104383 | 17.05.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US43996282 | 08.11.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0108635 | Global Dossier | 10.01.1996 | B2 | EP0108635 | 08.06.1988 | B1 | EP0108635 | 29.05.1985 | A3 | EP0108635 | 16.05.1984 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US43996282 | 08.11.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1230195 | 08.12.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US43996282 | 08.11.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3376983D1 | 14.07.1988 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US43996282 | 08.11.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8605831 | 01.04.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US43996282 | 08.11.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR81278 | 11.12.1984 | B | Priority number | Date | US43996282 | 08.11.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0316866B | 06.03.1991 | B2 | JPS5997654 | 05.06.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US43996282 | 08.11.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ206057 | 21.02.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US43996282 | 08.11.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4539981 | 10.09.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US43996282 | 08.11.1982 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA838283 | 26.06.1985 | B | Priority number | Date | US43996282 | 08.11.1982 |