EP0108635 - Absorbable bone fixation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.11.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Products Inc. 501 George Street New Brunswick New Jersey 08903 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Products Inc. 501 George Street New Brunswick New Jersey 08903 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tunc, Deger C. 6 Springfield Road East Brunswick NJ 08816 / US | [1984/20] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1984/20] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 83306762.2 | 07.11.1983 | [1984/20] | Priority number, date | US19820439962 | 08.11.1982 Original published format: US 439962 | [1984/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0108635 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0108635 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0108635 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0108635 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/82, A61L17/00 | [1996/02] | CPC: |
C08G63/08 (EP,US);
A61L31/06 (EP,US);
Y10S606/908 (EP,US);
Y10S606/91 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61L31/06, A61B17/58 (US,EP);
A61L31/06, C08L67/04 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1984/20] | C08G63/10, A61L17/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1984/20] | Title | German: | Resorbierbare Vorrichtung zur Knochenbefestigung | [1984/20] | English: | Absorbable bone fixation device | [1984/20] | French: | Dispositif absorbable pour la fixation des os | [1984/20] | Examination procedure | 31.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/03] | 05.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.01.1989
26.01.1989
ADMISSIBLE Boehringer Ingelheim Zentrale GmbH D-55218 Ingelheim / DE | 02
06.03.1989
02.05.1989
ADMISSIBLE Stamicarbon bv Octrooiafdeling Postbus 605 NL-6160 AP Geleen / NL | [1989/20] |
Former [1989/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.01.1989
26.01.1989
ADMISSIBLE Boehringer Ingelheim Zentrale GmbH D-55218 Ingelheim / DE | 05.05.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.11.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.11.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 04.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 23.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 30.08.1994 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.09.1994 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.12.1994 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.01.1995 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 02.08.1991 | Appeal received No. T0581/91 | 15.10.1991 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.08.1993 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 04.08.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.08.1993 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DD14548 ; | [A]US2703316 (SCHNEIDER ALLAN K); | [A]FR1254015 (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG); | [A]FR1425333 (DU PONT); | [A]US3773919 (BOSWELL G, et al); | [A]EP0011528 | [ ] - D.K. GILDING et al. "Biodegradable polymers for use in surgery - polyglycolic/polylactic acid homo- and copolymers", pages 1459-1464 | [A] - POLYMER vol. 20, December 1979; D.K. GILDING et al. "Biodegradable polymers for use in surgery - polyglycolic/polylactic acid homo- and copolymers", pages 1459-1464 |