EP0116791 - Method of manufacturing a matrix infra-red detector with front side illumination [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.1988 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1989 [1989/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE ANONYME DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS (S.A.T.) 40 avenue de New York 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/35] | For all designated states SOCIETE ANONYME DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS (S.A.T.) 40 avenue de New York F-75116 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bourdillot, Michel Yves 41, rue Cantagrel F-75624 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | 02 /
Gauthier, André 41, rue Cantagrel F-75624 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | 03 /
Maille, Jacques Henri 41, rue Cantagrel F-75624 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | 04 /
Pitault, Bernard Marcel 41, rue Cantagrel F-75624 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | [1984/35] | Representative(s) | Bloch, Robert, et al 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/35] | Bloch, Robert, et al 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 83402291.5 | 29.11.1983 | [1984/35] | Priority number, date | FR19820020031 | 30.11.1982 Original published format: FR 8220031 | [1984/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0116791 | Date: | 29.08.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0116791 | Date: | 10.02.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H01L25/04, H01L27/14, H01L31/18 | [1984/35] | CPC: |
H01L27/14687 (EP,US);
H01L25/042 (EP,US);
H01L27/14649 (EP,US);
H01L27/14696 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
Y10S257/926 (EP,US);
Y10S438/977 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1984/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines matrixförmigen Infrarotdetektors mit Beleuchtung der Frontseite | [1984/35] | English: | Method of manufacturing a matrix infra-red detector with front side illumination | [1984/35] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un détecteur infrarouge matriciel à éclairage par la face avant | [1984/35] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/06] | 05.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.06.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3661741 [ ] (MEEK RONALD LEE); | FR2194047 [ ] (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | US3965568 [ ] (GOOCH ROLAND W); | GB1568958 [ ] (MULLARD LTD); | GB1597581 [ ] (SELENIA IND ELETTRONICHE); | FR2494910 [ ] (THOMSON CSF [FR]) |