EP0120094 - AZETIDINONE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.1990 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.1990 [1990/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OTSUKA KAGAKU YAKUHIN KABUSHIKI KAISHA 10, Bungomachi Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | For all designated states OTSUKA KAGAKU YAKUHIN KABUSHIKI KAISHA 10, Bungomachi Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORII, Shigeru 4-4-18, Sanyo-Danchi Sanyocho Akaiwa-gun Okayama 709-08 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Hideo 1-2, Tsushimanaka Okayama-shi Okayama 700 / JP | 03 /
NOGAMI, Junzo 10-30-10, Tsushimahigashi 2-chome Okayama-shi Okayama 700 / JP | 04 /
SASAOKA, Michio 23-4, Aza Nakasu Nakamura Kitajimacho Itano-gun Tokushima 771-02 / JP | 05 /
SAITO, Norio 40-38, Aza Nakasao Shinkirai Kitajimacho Itano-gun Tokushima 771-02 / JP | 06 /
SHIROI, Takashi 72-2, Aza Motosu Nakamura Kitajimacho Itano-gun Tokushima 771-02 / JP | [1984/40] | Representative(s) | Dr. Solf & Zapf Patent- und Rechtsanwalts PartG mbB Candidplatz 15 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | Patentanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf Candidplatz 15 D-81543 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/40] | Kressin, Horst-Rüdiger, Dr. Herzog-Wilhelm-Strasse 16 D-8000 München 2 / DE | Application number, filing date | 83903008.7 | 24.09.1983 | [1984/40] | WO1983JP00315 | Priority number, date | JP19820167051 | 24.09.1982 Original published format: JP 16705182 | [1984/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8401152 | Date: | 29.03.1984 | [1984/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0120094 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0120094 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07D513/04 | [1984/40] | CPC: |
C07D513/04 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/40] | Title | German: | AZETIDINON-VERBINDUNGEN | [1984/40] | English: | AZETIDINONE COMPOUNDS | [1984/40] | French: | COMPOSES D'AZETIDINONE | [1984/40] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.1984 | Translation filed | 23.05.1984 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.1984 | Search fee paid | 23.05.1984 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.1984 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/44] | 17.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1472868 (FARMACEUTICI ITALIA); | [X]US4172078 (MICETICH RONALD G [CA], et al); | [X]GB2101986 (OTSUKA KAGAKU YAKUHIN [JP]) | International search | [X]JPS5143791 (FARMACEUTICI ITALIA); | [X]JPS55147293 (LILLY CO ELI); | [X]JPS5759896 (OTSUKA KAGAKU YAKUHIN); | [X]JPS5759897 (OTSUKA KAGAKU YAKUHIN) | Examination | EP0117875 | by applicant | US4077970 | EP0019387 | GB2101986 | EP0117875 |