Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] |
08.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1989 [1989/04] |
24.12.1987 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.02.1988 [1988/06] |
01.07.1986 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 20.08.1986 [1986/34] |
18.12.1984 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.02.1985 [1985/08] |
21.07.1984 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.09.1984 [1984/38] |