Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE32461T | 15.02.1988 | T1 | Priority number | Date | HU50483 | 15.02.1983 | EP84101540 | 15.02.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0208147 | Global Dossier | 04.11.1987 | A3 | EP0208147 | 14.01.1987 | A2 | Priority number | Date | HU50483 | 15.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU580729B | Global Dossier | 02.02.1989 | B2 | AU2460184 | 23.08.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | HU50483 | 15.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0118794 | Global Dossier | 10.02.1988 | B1 | EP0118794 | 19.09.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | HU50483 | 15.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CS261865 | 10.02.1989 | B2 | CS101184 | 15.07.1988 | A2 | Priority number | Date | HU50483 | 15.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DD219363 | 06.03.1985 | A5 | Priority number | Date | HU50483 | 15.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3469299D1 | 17.03.1988 | D1 | Priority number | Date | HU50483 | 15.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK70284 | 16.08.1984 | A | DK70284D0 | 15.02.1984 | D0 | Priority number | Date | HU50483 | 15.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8700855 | 16.11.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | HU50483 | 15.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8708112 | 16.10.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | HU50483 | 15.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI840585 | 16.08.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | HU50483 | 15.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU194214 | 28.01.1988 | B | Priority number | Date | HU50483 | 15.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL70926 | 15.08.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | HU50483 | 15.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS59210077 | 28.11.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | HU50483 | 15.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL246226 | 30.07.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | HU50483 | 15.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT78110 | 30.04.1986 | B | PT78110 | 01.03.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | HU50483 | 15.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SU1468418 | 23.03.1989 | A3 | Priority number | Date | HU50483 | 15.02.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4716238 | 29.12.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | HU50483 | 15.02.1983 | Type | Divisional application | EP0208147 |