Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.1990 [1990/02] |
10.12.1988 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.01.1989 [1989/04] |
05.06.1987 | Change - first examination report | published on 22.07.1987 [1987/30] |
01.07.1986 | First examination report | |
24.09.1985 | Publication of search report | published on 27.11.1985 [1985/48] |
04.08.1984 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.10.1984 [1984/40] |
04.08.1984 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.10.1984 [1984/40] |