Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0120341 | Global Dossier | 25.01.1989 | B1 | EP0120341 | 27.11.1985 | A3 | EP0120341 | 03.10.1984 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CH164683 | 25.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3476381D1 | 02.03.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CH164683 | 25.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0557974B | 25.08.1993 | B2 | JPS59176224 | 05.10.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | CH164683 | 25.03.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4701540 | 20.10.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | CH164683 | 25.03.1983 |