EP0120341 - Process for the preparation of pentadienol derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1989 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.01.1990 [1990/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lukàc, Teodor Klusstrasse 32 CH-4147 Aesch / CH | 02 /
Soukup, Milan, Dr. Blumenweg CH-4332 Stein / CH | 03 /
Widmer, Erich, Dr. Mittelweg 47 CH-4142 Münchenstein / CH | [1984/40] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Hans, et al c/o A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Patentanwälte VSP Holbeinstrasse 36-38 Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1984/40] | Zimmermann, Hans, Dr., et al c/o A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Patentanwälte VSP Holbeinstrasse 36-38 Postfach 160 CH-4003 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 84102224.7 | 02.03.1984 | [1984/40] | Priority number, date | CH19830001646 | 25.03.1983 Original published format: CH 164683 | [1984/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0120341 | Date: | 03.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0120341 | Date: | 27.11.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0120341 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07C175/00, C07D317/72 | [1984/40] | CPC: |
C07D317/72 (EP,US);
C07C403/08 (EP,US);
C07C403/14 (EP,US);
C07C45/71 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
C07C2601/16 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/71, C07C49/517 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1984/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Pentadienol-Derivaten | [1984/40] | English: | Process for the preparation of pentadienol derivatives | [1984/40] | French: | Procédé de préparation de dérivés de pentadiénol | [1984/40] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/40] | 03.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2032906 ; | [X]DE2625259 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE); | [X]FR2467837 (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH]); | [Y]EP0004621 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) |