Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
08.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1991 [1991/31] |
23.06.1990 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.08.1990 [1990/32] |
12.09.1989 | First examination report | |
18.07.1988 | Publication of search report | published on 07.09.1988 [1988/36] |
26.01.1985 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.03.1985 [1985/13] |
26.01.1985 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.03.1985 [1985/13] |