Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3482923D1 | 13.09.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3330768 | 26.08.1983 | DE3482923 | 16.08.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0135150 | Global Dossier | 08.08.1990 | B1 | EP0135150 | 07.09.1988 | A3 | EP0135150 | 27.03.1985 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3330768 | 26.08.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3330768 | 14.03.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3330768 | 26.08.1983 |