EP0135150 - Polyimides and a process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.1991 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1991 [1991/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/13] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindner, Christian, Dr. Riehler Strasse 200 D-5000 Köln 60 / DE | 02 /
Korte, Siegfried, Dr. Bamberger Strasse 6 D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | 03 /
Stix, Wolfgang, Dr. Freudenbergstrasse 56b D-6901 Neckarsteinach / DE | 04 /
Süling, Carlhans, Dr. Carl-Leverkus-Strasse 10 D-5068 Odenthal / DE | 05 /
Ott, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Paul-Klee-Strasse 54 D-5090 Leverkusen / DE | [1985/13] | Application number, filing date | 84109742.1 | 16.08.1984 | [1985/13] | Priority number, date | DE19833330768 | 26.08.1983 Original published format: DE 3330768 | [1985/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0135150 | Date: | 27.03.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0135150 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0135150 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/10 | [1985/13] | CPC: |
C08G73/12 (EP);
C08F222/404 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/13] | Title | German: | Neue Polyimide und ein Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1985/13] | English: | Polyimides and a process for their preparation | [1985/13] | French: | Polyimides et un procédé pour leur préparation | [1985/13] | Examination procedure | 16.08.1984 | Examination requested [1985/13] | 14.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU584014 ; | [X]DE1795638 (GEN ELECTRIC) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 88, Nr. 12, 20. Maerz 1978, Seiten 25,26, Zusammenfassung Nr. 74889k, Columbus, Ohio, US; A.A. BERLIN et al.: "Polymerizable aromatic oligoimides"; & SU - A - 584 014, & OTKRYTYA, ISOBRET., PROM. OBRAZTSY, TOVARNYE ZNAKI 1977, 54(46), 56-57, & SU584014 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 76, Nr. 24, 12. Juni 1972, Seiten 2,3, Zusammenfassung Nr. 144580v, Columbus, Ohio, US; Y. MUSA et al.: "Synthesis of polyimides by photoaddition of bismaleimides to benzene", & J. POLYM. SCI., PART. A-1, 1972, 10(2), 319-327 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 81, Nr. 14, 7. Oktober 1985, Seiten 2,3, Zusammenfassung Nr. 78281j, Columbus, Ohio, US; B.A. ZHUBANOV et al.: "Diels-Alder condensation of mixed polyimides", & IZV. AKAD. NAUK. KAZ. SSR, SER. KHIM. 1974, 24(2), 78-81 |