Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0151703
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.11.1989 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] |
06.01.1989 |
Change - representative |
published on 22.02.1989 [1989/08] |
10.12.1988 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.01.1989 [1989/04] |
08.06.1988 |
Change - applicant |
published on 27.07.1988 [1988/30] |
08.06.1988 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.07.1988 [1988/30] |
08.01.1988 |
Change - representative |
published on 24.02.1988 [1988/08] |
07.12.1987 |
Change - representative |
published on 27.01.1988 [1988/04] |
10.04.1987 |
First examination report |
|
04.03.1986 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.04.1986 [1986/17] |
22.06.1985 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.08.1985 [1985/34] |