Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0151703 | Global Dossier | 25.01.1989 | B1 | EP0151703 | 21.08.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US56068983 | 12.12.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3476467D1 | 02.03.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US56068983 | 12.12.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS60135902 | 19.07.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US56068983 | 12.12.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4553818 | 19.11.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US56068983 | 12.12.1983 |