EP0144975 - Quaternised alkoxylated polyesters, process for their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.1988 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.1988 [1988/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/25] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofinger, Manfred, Dr. Hoher Göll Weg 7 D-8269 Burgkirchen / DE | 02 /
Reng, Alwin Im Schulzehnten 22 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | 03 /
Quack, Jochen Meinhard, Dr. Wilhelm-Reuter-Strasse D-6239 Eppstein/Taunus / DE | [1985/25] | Application number, filing date | 84114822.4 | 06.12.1984 | [1985/25] | Priority number, date | DE19833345156 | 14.12.1983 Original published format: DE 3345156 | [1985/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0144975 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0144975 | Date: | 31.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0144975 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/68, C08G63/76, A61K7/075 | [1985/25] | CPC: |
A61Q5/12 (EP,US);
A61K8/85 (EP,US);
C08G63/6854 (EP,US);
C08G63/914 (EP,US);
A61K2800/5426 (EP,US);
A61Q5/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/25] | Title | German: | Quaternäre oxalkylierte Polyester, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und deren Verwendung | [1985/25] | English: | Quaternised alkoxylated polyesters, process for their preparation and their use | [1985/25] | French: | Polyesters oxyalcoylés et quaternisés, procédé pour leur préparation et leur utilisation | [1985/25] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/52] | 09.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2112454 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH); | [A]US3816378 (SCHMADEL E); | [Y]FR2331324 (OREAL [FR]); | [A]GB2006237 (OREAL); | [YD]DE3032216 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) |