EP0131397 - Bitumenous compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.12.1991 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/03] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jevanoff, Andre 8 Avenue Wolfers B-1310 La Hulpe / BE | 02 /
Kresge, Edward Nathan 68 Parlin Lane Watchung, NJ / US | [1988/27] |
Former [1985/03] | 01 /
Jevanoff, Andre 8 Avenue Wolfers B-1310 La Hulpe / BE | ||
02 /
Kresge, Edward Nathan 68 Parlin Lane Watchung New Jersey / US | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1985/03] | Dew, Melvyn John Exxon Chemical Limited European Patents and Licences Exxon Chemical Technology Centre P.Po. Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire, OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 84304027.0 | 14.06.1984 | [1985/03] | Priority number, date | GB19830017540 | 28.06.1983 Original published format: GB 8317540 | [1985/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0131397 | Date: | 16.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0131397 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0131397 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C08L95/00, C08L23/02, // C08L23/16, C08L23/06, C08L23/12 | [1985/03] | CPC: |
C08L95/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/02 (KR);
C08L23/16 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08L95/00, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/03] | Title | German: | Bituminöse Zusammensetzungen | [1985/03] | English: | Bitumenous compositions | [1985/03] | French: | Compositions bitumineuses | [1985/03] | Examination procedure | 04.07.1984 | Examination requested [1985/03] | 23.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.12.1988
07.03.1989
ADMISSIBLE Hüls Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung/PB 15 D-45764 Marl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.12.1988
07.03.1989
ADMISSIBLE HÜLS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Patentabteilung/PB 15 D-45764 Marl / DE | 11.05.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.01.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.02.1990 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 06.04.1990 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 29.01.1991 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.04.1991 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.04.1991 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.05.1991 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 11.11.1991 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 06.07.1988 | [2006/32] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2219147 (PHOENIX GUMMIWERKE AG); | [A]FR2228817 (SIPLAST SOC NOUVELLE [FR]); | [AD]GB1400145 (BRIGGS AMASCO LTD); | [A]US3963659 (BINDER GERHARD, et al); | [A]US4368228 (GORGATI ROMOLO [IT]) |