Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0141587
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
12.11.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] |
06.03.1992 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.04.1992 [1992/18] |
24.08.1991 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.1991 [1991/42] |
03.08.1991 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.09.1991 [1991/39] |
26.07.1991 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.1991 [1991/38] |
16.05.1991 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.1991 [1991/27] |
18.08.1990 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 03.10.1990 [1990/40] |
10.08.1987 |
First examination report |
|
26.08.1986 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.10.1986 [1986/42] |
03.07.1986 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.08.1986 [1986/34] |
26.03.1986 |
Publication of search report |
published on 14.05.1986 [1986/20] |
24.05.1985 |
Change - German title |
published on 24.07.1985 [1985/30] |
24.05.1985 |
Change - French title |
published on 24.07.1985 [1985/30] |
16.03.1985 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.05.1985 [1985/20] |