Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE57110T | 15.10.1990 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP84307167 | 18.10.1984 | US54472483 | 24.10.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4584089 | 22.04.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US69855785 | 06.02.1985 | US54472483 | 24.10.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0141587 | Global Dossier | 03.10.1990 | B1 | EP0141587 | 14.05.1986 | A3 | EP0141587 | 15.05.1985 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US54472483 | 24.10.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1222502 | 02.06.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US54472483 | 24.10.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3483345D1 | 08.11.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US54472483 | 24.10.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS60110339 | 15.06.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US54472483 | 24.10.1983 |