EP0141587 - Borosilicate-containing catalyst and reforming processes employing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1991 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMOCO CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/34] | For all designated states AMOCO CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | ||
Former [1985/20] | For all designated states Standard Oil Company 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Unmuth, Eugene Eric 6 S 010 Greenwood Court Naperville Illinois 60540 / US | 02 /
Gutberlet, Louis Charles 1520 East Wakeman Avenue Wheaton Illinois 60187 / US | [1985/20] | Representative(s) | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 84307167.1 | 18.10.1984 | [1985/20] | Priority number, date | US19830544724 | 24.10.1983 Original published format: US 544724 | [1985/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0141587 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0141587 | Date: | 14.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0141587 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B01J37/04, B01J29/04, C10G35/095 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
B01J37/04 (EP);
B01J29/86 (EP);
C10G35/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/20] | Title | German: | Borsilikat enthaltender Katalysator und Verfahren zur Reformierung mit diesem Katalysator | [1985/30] | English: | Borosilicate-containing catalyst and reforming processes employing same | [1985/20] | French: | Catalyseur contenant un silicate de bore et procédé de reformage utilisant ce catalyseur | [1985/30] | Examination procedure | 05.08.1986 | Examination requested [1986/42] | 10.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.10.1990 | BE | 03.10.1990 | CH | 03.10.1990 | LI | 03.10.1990 | SE | 03.10.1990 | LU | 31.10.1990 | [1999/52] |
Former [1992/18] | AT | 03.10.1990 | |
BE | 03.10.1990 | ||
CH | 03.10.1990 | ||
LI | 03.10.1990 | ||
SE | 03.10.1990 | ||
Former [1991/42] | AT | 03.10.1990 | |
BE | 03.10.1990 | ||
SE | 03.10.1990 | ||
Former [1991/38] | BE | 03.10.1990 | |
SE | 03.10.1990 | ||
Former [1991/27] | SE | 03.10.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1459779 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO); | [YD]US4141859 (PLANK CHARLES J, et al); | [YD]US4268420 (KLOTZ MARVIN R); | [A]GB2115306 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP) |