EP0142402 - Horizontal continuous casting installation for metals, especially for steel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.1986 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT DE RECHERCHES DE LA SIDERURGIE FRANCAISE (IRSID) France 185, rue Président Roosevelt F-78105 Saint-Germain-en-Laye / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/21] | For all designated states INSTITUT DE RECHERCHES DE LA SIDERURGIE FRANCAISE (IRSID) France 185, rue Président Roosevelt F-78105 Saint-Germain-en-Laye / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alberny, Robert 87 bis, rue Georges Ducrocq F-57000 Metz / FR | 02 /
Hackl, Helmut Sturefors Gard 59054 Sturefors / SE | [1985/21] | Representative(s) | Ventavoli, Roger, et al TECHMETAL PROMOTION (Groupe USINOR) Immeuble "La Pacific" 11/13 Cours Valmy La Défense 7 TSA 10001 92070 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/21] | Ventavoli, Roger, et al TECHMETAL PROMOTION (Groupe USINOR SACILOR), Immeuble " La Pacific ", 11/13 Cours Valmy - La Défense 7, TSA 10001 F-92070 Paris La Défense Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401946.3 | 28.09.1984 | [1985/21] | Priority number, date | FR19830016361 | 14.10.1983 Original published format: FR 8316361 | [1985/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0142402 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/04, B22D11/14 | [1985/21] | CPC: |
B22D11/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/21] | Title | German: | Anlage zum horizontalen Stranggiessen von Metallen, insbesondere von Stahl | [1985/21] | English: | Horizontal continuous casting installation for metals, especially for steel | [1985/21] | French: | Installation de coulee continue horizontale des metaux notamment de l'acier | [1985/21] | File destroyed: | 15.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 23.01.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/30] | 17.02.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2080898 ; | [AD]FR2077534 ; | [A]GB1094651 ; | [A]US3344846 ; | [A]US3390716 |