|
16.12.1993 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1993 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.1993 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.1993 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.10.1993 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1993 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.07.1993 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.1993 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.1993 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1993 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.04.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.04.1993 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.1993 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.04.1993 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.04.1993 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.04.1993 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.1993 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.04.1993 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.1993 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.1993 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.1993 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.1993 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.1993 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.03.1993 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.02.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
15 |
|
19.02.1993 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1993 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.02.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.02.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.01.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.1992 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.1992 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.1992 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.1992 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.1992 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1992 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.09.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.09.1992 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.09.1992 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.1992 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.1992 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1992 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.08.1992 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1992 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.1992 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.1992 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.1992 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.1992 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.1992 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.1992 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.03.1992 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.1992 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1992 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.12.1991 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1991 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.12.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.1991 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.08.1991 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.1991 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.1990 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.1990 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.08.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.1990 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.05.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1990 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.01.1989 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.1988 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.1988 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.1988 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.08.1988 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.1988 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.1988 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.1988 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
22.04.1988 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.1987 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.09.1986 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.06.1986 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.04.1986 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.1985 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.1985 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.1985 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.1985 |
Final instructions concerning extension or validation states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.1985 |
Refund of (partial) search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.1985 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.1985 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.01.1985 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.1985 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.1984 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.10.1984 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.1984 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.10.1984 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
26.10.1984 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.1984 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.1984 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
26.10.1984 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |