Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0143037
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
10.12.1993 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 26.01.1994 [1994/04] |
25.09.1992 |
Change - representative |
published on 11.11.1992 [1992/46] |
24.03.1992 |
Change - name/address |
published on 13.05.1992 [1992/20] |
13.09.1989 |
Opposition filed |
published on 02.11.1989 [1989/44] |
31.12.1988 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.02.1989 [1989/07] |
13.05.1987 |
Change - first examination report |
published on 01.07.1987 [1987/27] |
04.06.1986 |
First examination report |
|
24.04.1986 |
Change - applicant |
published on 11.06.1986 [1986/24] |
30.03.1985 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.05.1985 [1985/22] |
30.03.1985 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.05.1985 [1985/22] |