Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0143037 | Global Dossier | 26.01.1994 | B2 | EP0143037 | 15.02.1989 | B1 | EP0143037 | 29.05.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8317523 | 04.11.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3476761D1 | 23.03.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR8317523 | 04.11.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2554451 | 28.03.1986 | B1 | FR2554451 | 10.05.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8317523 | 04.11.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0115524B | 17.03.1989 | B2 | JPS60112824 | 19.06.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8317523 | 04.11.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0560486B | 02.09.1993 | B2 | JPS6230111 | 09.02.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8317523 | 04.11.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4595730 | 17.06.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8317523 | 04.11.1983 |