Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] |
05.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.1988 [1988/21] |
11.04.1987 | (Expected) grant | published on 27.05.1987 [1987/22] |
12.03.1986 | First examination report | |
04.05.1985 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.07.1985 [1985/27] |
04.05.1985 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.07.1985 [1985/27] |