Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE27443T | 15.06.1987 | T1 | Priority number | Date | CH335283 | 20.06.1983 | CH8400097 | 15.06.1984 | EP84902329 | 15.06.1984 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3463923D1 | 02.07.1987 | D1 | Priority number | Date | CH335283 | 20.06.1983 | CH8400097 | 15.06.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8500161 | Global Dossier | 17.01.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH335283 | 20.06.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU561763B | Global Dossier | 14.05.1987 | B2 | AU3015684 | 25.01.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | CH335283 | 20.06.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0146597 | Global Dossier | 27.05.1987 | B1 | EP0146597 | 03.07.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH335283 | 20.06.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4686036 | 11.08.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | CH335283 | 20.06.1983 |