Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] |
28.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] |
15.04.1989 | (Expected) grant | published on 31.05.1989 [1989/22] |
21.01.1988 | First examination report | |
11.11.1986 | Publication of search report | published on 30.12.1986 [1986/52] |
06.02.1986 | Request for examination filed | published on 26.03.1986 [1986/13] |
02.08.1985 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.10.1985 [1985/40] |