Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0156212 | Global Dossier | 31.05.1989 | B1 | EP0156212 | 30.12.1986 | A3 | EP0156212 | 02.10.1985 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US58803584 | 09.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3570701D1 | 06.07.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US58803584 | 09.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0216384B | 17.04.1990 | B2 | JPS60190571 | 28.09.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US58803584 | 09.03.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4525390 | 25.06.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US58803584 | 09.03.1984 |