EP0156212 - Process for plating copper from electroless plating compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.1990 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/40] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alpaugh, Warren Alan R.D. 2, Box 591 Chenango Forks New York 13746 / US | 02 /
Amelio, William Joseph 161 Deyo Hill Road Binghamton New York 13905 / US | 03 /
Markovich, Voya 3611 Joel Drive Endwell New York 13760 / US | 04 /
Sambucetti, Carlos Juan 4 Sassi Croton-on-Hudson New York 10520 / US | [1985/40] | Representative(s) | Kreidler, Eva-Maria Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/40] | Kreidler, Eva-Maria, Dr. rer. nat. Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 85102552.8 | 07.03.1985 | [1985/40] | Priority number, date | US19840588035 | 09.03.1984 Original published format: US 588035 | [1985/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0156212 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0156212 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0156212 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C23C18/40 | [1985/40] | CPC: |
C23C18/40 (EP,US);
H05K3/181 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum stromlosen Abscheiden von Kupferüberzügen | [1985/40] | English: | Process for plating copper from electroless plating compositions | [1985/40] | French: | Procédé de dépôt de cuivre par voie chimique | [1985/40] | Examination procedure | 24.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/13] | 26.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3853590 (KADISON L, et al); | [A]US4152467 (ALPAUGH WARREN A [US], et al) |