Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.1989 [1989/37] |
20.08.1988 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.10.1988 [1988/40] |
13.01.1988 | First examination report | |
23.12.1986 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.02.1987 [1987/07] |
26.11.1986 | Publication of search report | published on 14.01.1987 [1987/03] |
07.12.1985 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.02.1986 [1986/06] |