Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3565405D1 | 10.11.1988 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3565405 | 16.07.1985 | DE3427200 | 24.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0170157 | Global Dossier | 05.10.1988 | B1 | EP0170157 | 14.01.1987 | A3 | EP0170157 | 05.02.1986 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3427200 | 24.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3427200 | 30.01.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3427200 | 24.07.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4668775 | 26.05.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3427200 | 24.07.1984 |