EP0170157 - Methine dyes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.1989 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.1989 [1989/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/06] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergmann, Udo, Dr. Merckstrasse 26 D-6100 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Hahn, Erwin, Dr. Am Buechsenackerhang 31 D-6900 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Hansen, Guenther, Dr. Alwin-Mittasch-Platz 8 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1986/06] | Application number, filing date | 85108898.9 | 16.07.1985 | [1986/06] | Priority number, date | DE19843427200 | 24.07.1984 Original published format: DE 3427200 | [1986/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0170157 | Date: | 05.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0170157 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0170157 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07D333/26, C09B56/16, D06P3/52, D06P1/18, // C09B29/033 | [1986/06] | CPC: |
C09B56/16 (EP,US);
Y10S534/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1986/06] | Title | German: | Methinfarbstoffe | [1986/06] | English: | Methine dyes | [1986/06] | French: | Colorants méthiniques | [1986/06] | Examination procedure | 16.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/07] | 14.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2759103 [ ] (BAYER AG); | CH631197 [ ] (ICI LTD [GB]) |